IN SB0369 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 175: yeas 22, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 175: yeas 22, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Regional transit expansion. Allows counties to impose an additional local income tax rate to fund the operations of a public transportation corporation and the operations of a rural transportation assistance program if the: (1) voters of the county approve a local public question; and (2) fiscal body of the county adopts an ordinance to impose the additional tax rate. Provides that the rate must be at least 0.1% but not more than 0.25%. Excludes from this provision any county that is eligible to hold a referendum on funding transportation projects under the central Indiana public transportation projects statute.
Title
Regional transit expansion.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 175: yeas 22, nays 27 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as third author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Alting added as author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Stoops removed as author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Alting removed as second author |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stoops |