IN SB0400 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Assessment and taxation of golf courses. Defines the term "yard improvements" in connection with the assessment of a golf course. Requires the department of local government finance to annually establish uniform income capitalization rates to be used for golf course assessments. Specifies information assessing officials are required to use in determining average net operating income.
Title
Assessment and taxation of golf courses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Miller D |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buchanan |