IN SB0402 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Seasonal employment. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying seasonal employment.
Title
Seasonal employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehe |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buchanan |