IN SB0407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Economic and regulatory policy task force. Establishes the economic and regulatory policy task force. Provides for members of the task force and duties of the task force. Requires the task force to prepare a report and recommendations.
Title
Economic and regulatory policy task force. Establishes the economic and regulatory policy task force. Provides for members of the task force and duties of the task force. Requires the task force to prepare a report and recommendations.
Sponsors
Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] | Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as coauthor |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Spartz) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senator Buchanan removed as coauthor |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as coauthor |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Spartz |