IN SB0407 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer credit transactions. Amends the Uniform Consumer Credit Code (UCCC) as follows: (1) Specifies that the UCCC applies to any consumer credit transaction entered into by a creditor and a resident of Indiana regardless of whether: (A) the creditor has a physical presence in any state; or (B) the transaction is conducted, in whole or in part, by means of the Internet. (2) Specifies that the licensing requirements under the UCCC apply to any person that regularly engages in making consumer loans in Indiana regardless of whether: (A) the person has a physical presence in any state; or (B) the loan transactions are conducted, in whole or in part, by means of the Internet. (3) Provides that after June 30, 2020, a lender may not contract for or receive the authorized minimum finance charge upon a borrower's prepayment of the second or any subsequent refinancing of a consumer loan made to that borrower by the lender. (4) Provides that after June 30, 2020, a lender may not assess the authorized nonrefundable prepaid finance charge on the second or any subsequent refinancing of a consumer loan made to a borrower by the lender. (5) Provides that a creditor: (A) who is licensed with the department of financial institutions (department) under the UCCC or is required to be licensed with the department; and (B) who violates the UCCC; commits a deceptive act that is actionable by the attorney general or a consumer under the deceptive consumer sales act.
Title
Consumer credit transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senators Merritt and Alting added as coauthors |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Stoops added as coauthors |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/407/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/2/2/4222eb7c/SB0407.01.INTR.pdf |