IN SB0416 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Gary Community School Corporation. Requires that the distressed unit appeal board (DUAB) hold a public hearing on the Gary Community School Corporation's current status as a distressed unit before December 31, 2022. Establishes the distressed political subdivision school improvement fund (fund). Provides that DUAB administers the fund. Provides that the following amount of money withheld from the distribution of state tuition support for common school fund obligations of a school corporation that has been designated a distressed political subdivision must be deposited in the fund: (1) For state fiscal years 2021 through 2023, 100% of the money that the state board of finance withholds from the distribution of state tuition support. (2) For state fiscal years 2024 through 2026, 75% of the money that the state board of finance withholds from the distribution of state tuition support. (3) For state fiscal years 2027 through 2030, 50% of the money that the state board of finance withholds from the distribution of state tuition support. Provides that the deposit of withheld state tuition support amounts into the fund ends July 1, 2030. Requires the state board of finance to extend the term of the common school fund obligations to account for the deposits into the fund. Provides that a school corporation that has been designated as a distressed political subdivision may submit a request to DUAB for money from the fund for projects approved by the DUAB after recommendations from the mayor of the city in which the school corporation is located. Provides that the governing body of a school corporation may enter into a public-private agreement for the construction of new school buildings after review of the agreement by the budget committee. Provides that, if the Gary community school corporation sells real property, a building, or other structure owned by the school corporation, the proceeds from the sale must be deposited into the fund.
Title
Gary Community School Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T., Hatcher, Smith, V. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Harris |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senators Holdman, Crider, Boots added as coauthors |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as third author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senators Ford J.D. and Randolph added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Melton |