IN SB0427 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provisional occupational license. Allows a person who: (1) is the spouse of an active duty member of the armed forces assigned to Indiana; (2) affirms certain information concerning the person's licensure in the other state; (3) submits verification that the person is licensed in a regulated occupation in at least one other state; (4) has passed a national criminal background check; and (5) submits an application and pays any application fee; to be issued a provisional license for the regulated occupation at the same practice level allowed by the license held by the person in the other state. Provides that provisional licensing does not apply to a license that is established or recognized through an interstate compact, a reciprocity agreement, or a comity agreement that is established by a board or by law. Establishes penalties for submission of false information for purposes of obtaining a provisional license.
Title
Provisional occupational license.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. John Bartlett [D] |
Rep. Steve Bartels [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 89 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 332: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-25 | House | Representatives Bartlett and Bartels added as cosponsors |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Brown, T. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Zent |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Buchanan) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second author |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buchanan |