IN SB0430 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reservoir conservancy districts. Allows a conservancy district to be established as a "reservoir conservancy district" if: (1) the conservancy district will be established for certain purposes; (2) the boundaries will encompass part or all of a reservoir located partly within a consolidated city; and (3) at least 25% of the surface of the reservoir is owned by a utility governed by a board of directors for utilities of a consolidated city. Requires the board of directors of a reservoir conservancy district and the utility that owns the reservoir (utility owner) to enter into an operating agreement that describes all works of improvement and maintenance that the reservoir conservancy district proposes to perform. Requires that all such works be approved by the utility owner before the work begins. Provides that a reservoir conservancy district has all of the powers granted to other conservancy districts with certain exceptions, including: (1) a reservoir conservancy district does not have the power of eminent domain; and (2) the utility owner is exempt from all assessments, taxes, and fees imposed by the reservoir conservancy district. Imposes a limit on the special benefits tax levy of a reservoir conservancy district. Authorizes a reservoir conservancy district to impose and collect fees for the recreational use of watercraft on the reservoir, but provides that a one year use fee for a nonresident may not be 50% greater than the one year use fee for a resident, and that a one-day use fee may not exceed 17% of a one year use fee. Authorizes a reservoir conservancy district to establish rules concerning safety and resource conservation but provides that the rules shall not interfere with state rules or with the use of the reservoir for water supply purposes, shall not impair the commercial license of the commercial licensee of the utility owner, and shall not discourage uses of the reservoir for activities allowed under the fish and wildlife laws. Authorizes a reservoir conservancy district to: (1) install catch basins and filtration systems; (2) implement erosion control measures; (3) dredge; and (4) take other actions; with authorization from state and federal agencies. Provides that the utility owner has sole authority to control the water level and water quality of the reservoir. Provides that, except in a case of intentional or willful and wanton misconduct, the utility owner is not liable for any personal injury, death, property damage, or other loss that an individual incurs while present on or in the reservoir. Includes provisions concerning the potential civil liability of the utility owner, the state, the reservoir conservancy district, and owners of property located in a reservoir conservancy district for personal injury, death, or property damage occurring within the reservoir conservancy district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reservoir conservancy districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wolkins
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 46, nays 2
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #6 (Spartz) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #3 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateSenator Messmer added as second author
2020-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2020-01-16SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/430/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/f/3/6bf30612/SB0430.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/6/6/ae66f862/SB0430.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/e/1/c9e16b08/SB0430.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/1/d/881dd9f8/SB0430.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/3/0/183050b0/SB0430.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/2/c/632c8d7c/SB0430.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/a/9/faa9fb44/SB0430.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/0/0/6e009125/SB0430.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/3/e/8c3e7bd2/SB0430.191_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/f/1/e7f162c7/SB0430.03.ENGS.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback