IN SB0434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Private card games. Defines "private low stakes card game" and provides a defense to certain gambling crimes if the gambling was a private low stakes card game. Defines "cheating" and makes cheating at gambling a Class A misdemeanor, and increases the penalty for the offense based on the gain obtained by cheating. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Private card games.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Eberhart |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 33, nays 16 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |