IN SB0436 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

State and local administration. Changes the terminology used in the statute governing the posting of signs to promote attractions and services for the traveling public. Allows the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to apply for a state plan amendment that would require Medicaid reimbursement for eligible Medicaid rehabilitation option services provided in a school setting to a Medicaid recipient. Requires the office to review the Medicaid rehabilitation option services provided under Medicaid, determine whether additional services are appropriate, and submit the office's findings to the general assembly. Requires the office to study and report on the best means to provide: (1) Medicaid reimbursement for health care services and school based services to specified individuals provided by a school based health center; and (2) supplemental Medicaid reimbursement payments to qualified school based health centers under the fee for service Medicaid program. Requires a public library to adopt a criminal history check policy for employees and volunteers. Requires the board of veterinary medical examiners to study the regulation of veterinary technicians. Specifies contract requirements in hospital participation agreements between managed care organizations and multi-location hospitals. Voids certain waiver agreements between managed care organizations and multi-location hospitals. Establishes rates of payment for various emergency services and post-stabilization services furnished to individuals enrolled in a managed care organization. Specifies conditions concerning the assignment of benefits for emergency services and post-stabilization care services provided to insured persons. Provides for the resubmission of certain claims that were denied because the originally submitted claims identified the providers incorrectly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local administration. Changes the terminology used in the statute governing the posting of signs to promote attractions and services for the traveling public. Allows the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to apply for a state plan amendment that would require Medicaid reimbursement for eligible Medicaid rehabilitation option services provided in a school setting to a Medicaid recipient. Requires the office to review the Medicaid rehabilitation option services provided under Medicaid, determine whether additional services are appropriate, and submit the office's findings to the general assembly. Requires the office to study and report on the best means to provide: (1) Medicaid reimbursement for health care services and school based services to specified individuals provided by a school based health center; and (2) supplemental Medicaid reimbursement payments to qualified school based health centers under the fee for service Medicaid program. Requires a public library to adopt a criminal history check policy for employees and volunteers. Requires the board of veterinary medical examiners to study the regulation of veterinary technicians. Specifies contract requirements in hospital participation agreements between managed care organizations and multi-location hospitals. Voids certain waiver agreements between managed care organizations and multi-location hospitals. Establishes rates of payment for various emergency services and post-stabilization services furnished to individuals enrolled in a managed care organization. Specifies conditions concerning the assignment of benefits for emergency services and post-stabilization care services provided to insured persons. Provides for the resubmission of certain claims that were denied because the originally submitted claims identified the providers incorrectly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-11HouseRepresentative Fleming added as cosponsor
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Statutory Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation
2019-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-25SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateCosponsors: Representatives Bacon and Zent
2019-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Clere
2019-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-02-21SenateReread second time: ordered engrossed
2019-02-18SenateSenator Garten added as coauthor
2019-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-04SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-24SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Zay

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/436/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/a/a/59aa4916/SB0436.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/e/f/23ef7dfb/SB0436.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/2/2/f22206d4/SB0436.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/5/1/9e51f807/SB0436.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/8/1/bc81074d/SB0436.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/6/a/506af100/SB0436.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/e/c/fbec0cbb/SB0436.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/f/8/10f8cb70/SB0436.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/1/a/c01a2ab3/SB0436.05.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/e/2/8ae25e4f/SB0436.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/9/9/c1995144/SB0436.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/0/4/4e04041c/SB0436.192.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/e/c/cfecc6a0/SB0436.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/7/2/9672d4b7/SB0436.04.COMH.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback