IN SB0438 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 275
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 275
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Amends requirements to be eligible for a career specialist permit. Establishes requirements to be eligible for a workplace specialist license. (The current requirements to be eligible for a workplace specialist license are in rules adopted by the state board of education.) Requires the department of education to enter into the National Association of State Directors of Teacher Education and Certification (NASDTEC) Interstate Agreement. Requires the commission for higher education to establish a dual credit advisory council (council) to review and update, as needed, the requirements under HEA 1370-2016 (P.L.175-2016) concerning ensuring that a teacher who currently teaches a high school dual credit course on behalf of or under an agreement with a state educational institution can, by July 1, 2022, meet accreditation requirements established by the state educational institution's regional accrediting agency or an association recognized by the United States Department of Education. Requires, not later than November 1, 2019, the council to submit a report to the legislative council concerning the council's findings and recommendations. Removes, for purposes of obtaining an initial practitioner teaching license, the requirement that an individual must pass a written examination in basic reading, writing, and mathematics (CASA examination). Provides that the state board of education may create a method or model to align currently used performance evaluation plan factors with certain indicators.
Title
Various education matters. Amends requirements to be eligible for a career specialist permit. Establishes requirements to be eligible for a workplace specialist license. (The current requirements to be eligible for a workplace specialist license are in rules adopted by the state board of education.) Requires the department of education to enter into the National Association of State Directors of Teacher Education and Certification (NASDTEC) Interstate Agreement. Requires the commission for higher education to establish a dual credit advisory council (council) to review and update, as needed, the requirements under HEA 1370-2016 (P.L.175-2016) concerning ensuring that a teacher who currently teaches a high school dual credit course on behalf of or under an agreement with a state educational institution can, by July 1, 2022, meet accreditation requirements established by the state educational institution's regional accrediting agency or an association recognized by the United States Department of Education. Requires, not later than November 1, 2019, the council to submit a report to the legislative council concerning the council's findings and recommendations. Removes, for purposes of obtaining an initial practitioner teaching license, the requirement that an individual must pass a written examination in basic reading, writing, and mathematics (CASA examination). Provides that the state board of education may create a method or model to align currently used performance evaluation plan factors with certain indicators.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Public Law 275 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-24 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 646: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 615: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2019-04-24 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as conferee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator Melton removed as conferee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator Raatz removed as advisor |
2019-04-16 | House | House advisors appointed: Jordan, Cook, DeLaney and Klinker |
2019-04-16 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Pfaff |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Raatz and Stoops |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Zay and Melton |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-11 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 439: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Representative Jordan added as cosponsor |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zay |