IN SB0438 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of pesticide use and application. Makes various changes to the statutes governing pesticide registration and pesticide use and application. Requires the pesticide review board (board) to establish a working group to review civil penalties and for the working group to make recommendations (before December 1, 2020) concerning civil penalties to the board and the general assembly. Provides that the state chemist shall suspend the enforcement of its FY 2019 pesticide enforcement response policy.
Title
Regulation of pesticide use and application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 91 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 371: yeas 92, nays 4 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 365: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2020-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Prescott, Baird, Steuerwald, Deal and Moed |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehe and Wright |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Glick and Taylor G |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Leising and Lanane |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 84, nays 10 |
2020-02-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Prescott |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehe |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 38, nays 9 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |