IN SB0440 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
TANF eligibility. Sets the income eligibility requirements for the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program at phased in specified percentages of the federal income poverty level beginning July 1, 2021. Requires the division of family resources to amend the state TANF plan or take any other action necessary to implement the income requirements. Increases certain payment amounts under the TANF program beginning January 1, 2020. Requires the payments to be annually adjusted using the Social Security cost of living adjustment rate, but provides that the total adjustment in a year must be reduced to the extent the adjustment would result in the transfer to the Child Care and Development Fund grant program being less than the maximum allowable transfer under federal law. Authorizes emergency rulemaking concerning the payments. Repeals language requiring the division of family resources to apply a percentage reduction to the total needs of TANF applicants and recipients in computing TANF benefits.
Title
TANF eligibility. Sets the income eligibility requirements for the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program at phased in specified percentages of the federal income poverty level beginning July 1, 2021. Requires the division of family resources to amend the state TANF plan or take any other action necessary to implement the income requirements. Increases certain payment amounts under the TANF program beginning January 1, 2020. Requires the payments to be annually adjusted using the Social Security cost of living adjustment rate, but provides that the total adjustment in a year must be reduced to the extent the adjustment would result in the transfer to the Child Care and Development Fund grant program being less than the maximum allowable transfer under federal law. Authorizes emergency rulemaking concerning the payments. Repeals language requiring the division of family resources to apply a percentage reduction to the total needs of TANF applicants and recipients in computing TANF benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Representative Frizzell added as cosponsor |
2019-03-11 | House | Representatives Clere and Pfaff added as cosponsors |
2019-03-11 | House | Representative DeVon removed as cosponsor |
2019-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative DeVon |
2019-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ziemke |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senators Becker and Melton added as coauthors |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as third author |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |