IN SB0448 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nonprofit hospital report. Requires a nonprofit hospital to annually report the policies, procedures, activities, or any other actions taken by the nonprofit hospital in the preceding calendar year that were intended to make health care more affordable.
Title
Nonprofit hospital report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Schaibley |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |