IN SB0449 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Juveniles. For certain serious offenses committed by a juvenile: (1) reduces the minimum age for committing the child to the department of correction from 13 to 12; (2) adds an attempt to commit certain serious offenses to the list of serious offenses allowing wardship by the department of correction; and (3) permits the court to commit a juvenile to the department of correction for up to six years. Requires the department of correction to provide the court with a progress report for a child committed to the department for six years at the time the child turns 18, and requires the court to review the report and determine the appropriateness of release. Specifies that the juvenile court lacks jurisdiction over certain juveniles charged with an attempt to commit certain crimes. Establishes a two-year disproportionality review panel staffed by the Indiana criminal justice institute to study the issue of disparate racial impact with respect to juvenile court direct file, discretionary transfer, and waiver provisions. Defines "young offender" and prohibits the department of correction from housing a young offender with the general population of a penal facility. Prohibits a jail from housing a child less than eighteen years of age in the same cell as an adult.
Title
Juveniles.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Rep. Sharon Negele [R] |
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Torr |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Negele |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Authored by Senator Houchin |