IN SB0450 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Representative Leonard added as cosponsor
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Representative Leonard added as cosponsor
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Low head dams. Requires the natural resources commission to establish a roster of low head dams in the state that are capable of creating hazardous currents that pose safety issues. Establishes requirements concerning low head dams for the department of natural resources (department) and owners of low head dams. Except for purposes of an inspection, maintenance, or removal, prohibits a person from accessing a low head dam. Prohibits wading, boating, swimming, or accessing the waters within 50 feet of a low head dam when warning signs are present. Provides that the state is not liable for any death or injury that occurs on or resulting from a low head dam that is not owned by the state. Provides for a penalty for violations. Requires the department to prepare a report that includes recommendations concerning the creation of a low head dam removal program and any recommendations concerning low head dam safety legislation.
Title
Low head dams.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] | Rep. Daniel Leonard [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Leonard added as cosponsor |
2020-02-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Manning |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as third author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Authored by Senator Busch |