IN SB0476 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Homelessness study. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of homelessness to an appropriate interim study committee in 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homelessness study. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of homelessness to an appropriate interim study committee in 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Speedy
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 240: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateSenator Breaux added as third author
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Sandlin

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback