IN SB0486 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal law issues. Specifies, for purposes of operating while intoxicated, the manner in which a chemical test for THC must be conducted. Requires the state department of toxicology to adopt rules relating to the administration of a chemical test for THC. Permits a prosecuting attorney to file for revocation of a community corrections placement. Removes a provision making the violation of a home detention order the crime of escape. Makes maintaining a common nuisance a Class A misdemeanor unless: (1) the person has a prior conviction; or (2) the common nuisance is used for human trafficking, or for cocaine, methamphetamine, or a schedule I or II narcotic drug. Removes a provision making receipt of a report a prerequisite for imposing of a two year probationary period on a misdemeanant convicted of a crime relating to substance abuse. Allows certain individuals who commit an offense in a penal facility to be sentenced to the department of correction. Provides that the exception allowing a person to possess a firearm on school property does not apply if the person commits an offense on school property. Increases the penalty for domestic battery if the defendant has a prior conviction for strangulation, and increases the penalty for strangulation if the person has a prior strangulation conviction.
Title
Criminal law issues. Specifies, for purposes of operating while intoxicated, the manner in which a chemical test for THC must be conducted. Requires the state department of toxicology to adopt rules relating to the administration of a chemical test for THC. Permits a prosecuting attorney to file for revocation of a community corrections placement. Removes a provision making the violation of a home detention order the crime of escape. Makes maintaining a common nuisance a Class A misdemeanor unless: (1) the person has a prior conviction; or (2) the common nuisance is used for human trafficking, or for cocaine, methamphetamine, or a schedule I or II narcotic drug. Removes a provision making receipt of a report a prerequisite for imposing of a two year probationary period on a misdemeanant convicted of a crime relating to substance abuse. Allows certain individuals who commit an offense in a penal facility to be sentenced to the department of correction. Provides that the exception allowing a person to possess a firearm on school property does not apply if the person commits an offense on school property. Increases the penalty for domestic battery if the defendant has a prior conviction for strangulation, and increases the penalty for strangulation if the person has a prior strangulation conviction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 36, nays 4 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |