IN SB0490 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Representative Bartels added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Representative Bartels added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
National guard life insurance program. Requires the adjutant general of the Indiana national guard to facilitate the state sponsored group term life insurance program for members of the Indiana national guard.
Title
National guard life insurance program. Requires the adjutant general of the Indiana national guard to facilitate the state sponsored group term life insurance program for members of the Indiana national guard.
Sponsors
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] |
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Bruce Borders [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Rep. Steve Bartels [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Representative Bartels added as cosponsor |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senators Garten and Sandlin added as coauthors |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Borders and Bacon |
2019-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tomes |