IN SB0523 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Waiver of interest and penalties. Provides that the fiscal body of a county may adopt an ordinance to establish a property tax amnesty program and require a waiver of interest and penalties added before January 1, 2019, on delinquent taxes and special assessments on real property in the county if: (1) all of the delinquent taxes and special assessments on the real property were first due and payable before January 1, 2019; and (2) before May 1, 2020, the taxpayer has paid all of these delinquent taxes and special assessments and has also paid all of the taxes and special assessments that are first due and payable after December 31, 2018. Requires the waiver of interest and penalties in these circumstances, notwithstanding any payment arrangement entered into by the county treasurer and the taxpayer. Provides that the waiver of interest and penalties under a program shall not apply to interest and penalties added to delinquent property tax installments or special assessments on real property that was purchased or sold in any prior tax sale.
Title
Waiver of interest and penalties. Provides that the fiscal body of a county may adopt an ordinance to establish a property tax amnesty program and require a waiver of interest and penalties added before January 1, 2019, on delinquent taxes and special assessments on real property in the county if: (1) all of the delinquent taxes and special assessments on the real property were first due and payable before January 1, 2019; and (2) before May 1, 2020, the taxpayer has paid all of these delinquent taxes and special assessments and has also paid all of the taxes and special assessments that are first due and payable after December 31, 2018. Requires the waiver of interest and penalties in these circumstances, notwithstanding any payment arrangement entered into by the county treasurer and the taxpayer. Provides that the waiver of interest and penalties under a program shall not apply to interest and penalties added to delinquent property tax installments or special assessments on real property that was purchased or sold in any prior tax sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Ragen Hatcher [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2019-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Hatcher |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Melton |