IN SB0543 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marion County sports development area. Establishes an additional professional sports development area in Marion County to capture state and local revenue for capital improvements. Provides for the issuance of indebtedness to finance a multipurpose soccer stadium.
Title
Marion County sports development area. Establishes an additional professional sports development area in Marion County to capture state and local revenue for capital improvements. Provides for the issuance of indebtedness to finance a multipurpose soccer stadium.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Young M added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as third author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/543/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/a/6/67a6654b/SB0543.01.INTR.pdf |