IN SB0548 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Health care expenditure report and recommendation. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to collaborate with the department of insurance and report certain health care expenditure and cost information and recommendations to the legislative council concerning Medicaid. Requires the division of mental health and addiction, with the participation of the criminal justice institute, to provide an executive summary to the legislative council (and, to the extent possible, the standing committees concerning health) concerning the current health payment system and the legal system as each relates to mental health and addiction treatment services provided to individuals against whom criminal charges have been filed or who are incarcerated.
Title
Health care expenditure report and recommendation. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to collaborate with the department of insurance and report certain health care expenditure and cost information and recommendations to the legislative council concerning Medicaid. Requires the division of mental health and addiction, with the participation of the criminal justice institute, to provide an executive summary to the legislative council (and, to the extent possible, the standing committees concerning health) concerning the current health payment system and the legal system as each relates to mental health and addiction treatment services provided to individuals against whom criminal charges have been filed or who are incarcerated.
Sponsors
Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Schaibley |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second author |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Spartz |