IN SB0571 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 131: yeas 16, nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 131: yeas 16, nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Political parties and ballot access. Reduces the minimum number of votes cast at an election required for certain purposes from 2% of the votes cast in the last election for secretary of state to 0.5% of the votes cast at the most recent election for secretary of state. Defines "standard political party" as any of the following political parties: (1) A major political party. (2) A political party whose nominee for secretary of state received at least 0.5% of the total vote cast for secretary of state at the most recent election for secretary of state. (3) A political party that has obtained at least 4,500 signatures of voters in the state, including at least 500 signatures of voters from each congressional district, on a petition of nomination under IC 3-8-6-3. Permits a standard political party to nominate candidates by convention. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Political parties and ballot access. Reduces the minimum number of votes cast at an election required for certain purposes from 2% of the votes cast in the last election for secretary of state to 0.5% of the votes cast at the most recent election for secretary of state. Defines "standard political party" as any of the following political parties: (1) A major political party. (2) A political party whose nominee for secretary of state received at least 0.5% of the total vote cast for secretary of state at the most recent election for secretary of state. (3) A political party that has obtained at least 4,500 signatures of voters in the state, including at least 500 signatures of voters from each congressional district, on a petition of nomination under IC 3-8-6-3. Permits a standard political party to nominate candidates by convention. Makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 131: yeas 16, nays 31 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Crane added as third author |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker |