IN SB0625 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid nursing facility services. Extends the prohibition on the office of Medicaid policy and planning from including certain Medicaid recipients who receive nursing facility services in a Medicaid risk based managed care program or a capitated managed care program through June 30, 2021.
Title
Medicaid nursing facility services. Extends the prohibition on the office of Medicaid policy and planning from including certain Medicaid recipients who receive nursing facility services in a Medicaid risk based managed care program or a capitated managed care program through June 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] |
Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Shackleford, Clere and Kirchhofer |
2019-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 204: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as third author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Leising |