IN SB0632 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Radon in schools. Requires the state department of health (department) to distribute a manual of best practices for managing indoor air quality at schools, including recommendations for radon testing, to the legislative council, the department of education, the facilities manager and superintendent of each school corporation, and the chief administrative officer of each accredited nonpublic school. Requires the department to revise and distribute the manual to each school every three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Radon in schools. Requires the state department of health (department) to distribute a manual of best practices for managing indoor air quality at schools, including recommendations for radon testing, to the legislative council, the department of education, the facilities manager and superintendent of each school corporation, and the chief administrative officer of each accredited nonpublic school. Requires the department to revise and distribute the manual to each school every three years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenatePublic Law 21
2019-04-10SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-27HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 359: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-03-25HouseRepresentative Hamilton added as cosponsor
2019-03-25HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-03-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateCosponsors: Representatives Bacon, Lindauer and Cook
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Heaton
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateSenator Charbonneau added as third author
2019-02-21SenateSenator Melton added as second author
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-15SenateAuthored by Senator Bassler

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/632/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/0/7/d6071bb1/SB0632.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/8/c/218c05c5/SB0632.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/6/b/736b4d35/SB0632.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/1/7/2d173d23/SB0632.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/1/d/951d1c31/SB0632.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/1/1/571187a9/SB0632.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/8/4/b184889b/SB0632.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/2/5/80255255/SB0632.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/5/f/ad5f2d7b/SB0632.255.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/7/c/007cc3ed/SB0632.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/d/6/68d64328/SB0632.359.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback