IN SCR0048 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the Kappa Alpha Psi fraternity for its century of service within the community and its unyielding appreciation and support of diversity in all its forms.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the Kappa Alpha Psi fraternity for its century of service within the community and its unyielding appreciation and support of diversity in all its forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Summers |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Authored by Senator Melton |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/senate/concurrent/48/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/d/0/e2d0858b/SC0048.01.INTR.pdf |