IN SCR0049 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Gus Adams for his many years of teaching Franklin County students.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Gus Adams for his many years of teaching Franklin County students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lyness |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Authored by Senators Freeman, Leising, Raatz |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/senate/concurrent/49/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/b/3/fbb3372c/SC0049.01.INTR.pdf |