IN SR0021 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Senator Stoops added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign the topic of autism and public education to the appropriate study committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign the topic of autism and public education to the appropriate study committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2018-02-26SenateSenators Delph and Ford added as coauthors
2018-02-26SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2018-02-26SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2018-02-26SenateSenator Niezgodski removed as coauthor
2018-02-26SenateSecond reading: adopted voice vote
2018-02-22SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2018-02-22SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2018-02-22SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-02-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2018-02-12SenateAuthored by Senator Houchin

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback