KS HB2001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the reporting requirements for law enforcement agencies concerning civil asset seizures and forfeitures.
Title
Eliminating the reporting requirements for law enforcement agencies concerning civil asset seizures and forfeitures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | House | House Introduced |
2017-01-09 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, December 05, 2016 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2001/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2001_00_0000.pdf |