KS HB2005 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual to itemize deductions in Kansas despite not itemizing on their federal return.
Title
Allowing an individual to itemize deductions in Kansas despite not itemizing on their federal return.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2020-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-01-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-01-14 | House | House Introduced |
2019-01-14 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, January 2, 2019 |