KS HB2016 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
People with certain disabilities; motor vehicle registration information and notation on state-issued identification cards.
Title
People with certain disabilities; motor vehicle registration information and notation on state-issued identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELLED |
2017-01-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-09 | House | House Introduced |
2017-01-09 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 06, 2017 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2016/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2016_00_0000.pdf |