KS HB2018 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for Substitute for HB 2018 by Committee on Utilities - Restricting cities and counties from imposing certain regulations and fees on a video service provider for the provision of communications service through a micro wireless facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for Substitute for HB 2018 by Committee on Utilities - Restricting cities and counties from imposing certain regulations and fees on a video service provider for the provision of communications service through a micro wireless facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 104 Nay: 9 (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 5 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Call the Question - failed - Yea: 16 Nay: 24 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020
2020-05-21HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 26, 2020
2020-05-21HouseHouse Concurred with amendments; Yea: 104 Nay: 9
2020-05-21HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2020-05-21SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 5
2020-05-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained Yea: 26 Nay: 14
2020-05-21SenateSenate Senator Masterson raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2020-05-21SenateSenate Call the Question - failed Yea: 16 Nay: 24
2020-05-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
2020-05-21SenateSenate Committee Report adopted
2020-05-21SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2020-03-17SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Utilities
2020-03-17SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Utilities
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-26SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 4
2019-03-25HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jennings
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-03-12HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, January 28, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
2019-01-24HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-01-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-14HouseHouse Introduced
2019-01-14HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, January 10, 2019

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2018/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2018_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2018_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2018_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2018_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2018_04_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2018_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190326111820_388197/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200521114105_221736/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200521124010_002216/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200522034649_824213/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200521123611_511260/

Bill Comments

feedback