KS HB2032 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that sports gaming be operated and managed solely by racetrack gaming facilities.
Title
Requiring that sports gaming be operated and managed solely by racetrack gaming facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2019-01-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-15 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2032/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2032_00_0000.pdf |