KS HB2033 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 78 Nay: 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Kansas itemized deductions, election; providing for deferred foreign income, global intangible low-taxed income, capital contributions and FDIC premiums income tax modifications; expanding the expense deduction for all taxpayers; extending the net operating loss carryforward period; sales and compensating use tax, imposition of tax, nexus, remote sellers, marketplace facilitators, rate of tax on food and food ingredients; countywide retailers’ sales tax authority for Finney County and requirements for director of taxation for collection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kansas itemized deductions, election; providing for deferred foreign income, global intangible low-taxed income, capital contributions and FDIC premiums income tax modifications; expanding the expense deduction for all taxpayers; extending the net operating loss carryforward period; sales and compensating use tax, imposition of tax, nexus, remote sellers, marketplace facilitators, rate of tax on food and food ingredients; countywide retailers’ sales tax authority for Finney County and requirements for director of taxation for collection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 78 Nay: 39 (Y: 78 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 83 Nay: 41 (Y: 83 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 79 Nay: 36 (Y: 79 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseHouse Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 78 Nay: 39
2019-05-29HouseHouse Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Friday, May 17, 2019
2019-05-29HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 10, 2019
2019-05-04HouseHouse Reengrossed on Monday, May 6, 2019
2019-05-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 83 Nay: 41
2019-05-04HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
2019-05-02SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-05-02HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Mason and Representative Gartner appointed as second conferees
2019-05-01SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Wagle, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
2019-05-01SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-01SenateSenate Senator Wagle is appointed to replace Senator Tyson on the Conference Committee
2019-04-04SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
2019-04-04HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Johnson , Representative Mason and Representative Gartner as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-12SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-11SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-08HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, February 7, 2019
2019-02-08HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 79 Nay: 36
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, A. was adopted
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Smith, A.
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-01-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2019-01-23HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 23, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-01-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-01-16HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2033/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2033_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2033_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2033_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2033_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2033_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190208084233_928098/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190327105408_984582/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190502201534_670536/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190504234911_151795/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190529121103_186789/

Bill Comments

feedback