KS HB2042 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the authority of the secretary of state to prosecute election crimes.
Title
Removing the authority of the secretary of state to prosecute election crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 28, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2019-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-01-17 | House | House Introduced |