KS HB2049 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing criminal penalties for crimes committed against a law enforcement officer; the law enforcement protection act.
Title
Increasing criminal penalties for crimes committed against a law enforcement officer; the law enforcement protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 112 Nay: 8 (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected - Yea: 46 Nay: 64 (Y: 46 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected - Yea: 46 Nay: 64 (Y: 46 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 17, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 17, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 112 Nay: 8 |
2017-02-06 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 3, 2017 |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected Yea: 46 Nay: 64 |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-01-30 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2017-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-01-12 | House | House Introduced |