KS HB2051 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas innovation zone act and reinstating the Kansas enterprise zone act.
Title
Enacting the Kansas innovation zone act and reinstating the Kansas enterprise zone act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELLED |
2017-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-01-12 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2051/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2051_00_0000.pdf |