KS HB2063 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2063 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Discontinuing state property tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing for financing from the state general fund.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2063 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Discontinuing state property tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing for financing from the state general fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 102 Nay: 14 (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELED |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 102 Nay: 14 |
2019-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-01-23 | House | House Introduced |