KS HB2067 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the transfer upon death and providing for an income tax deduction for contributions to an ABLE account and conforming allowable expenses for 529 plans to federal law.
Title
Allowing the transfer upon death and providing for an income tax deduction for contributions to an ABLE account and conforming allowable expenses for 529 plans to federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 85 (Y: 37 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 18 Nay: 22 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 85 Nay: 38 (Y: 85 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 85 (Y: 37 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 18 Nay: 22 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 85 Nay: 38 (Y: 85 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Reengrossed on Thursday, May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 1 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as third conferees |
2017-05-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Phillips and Representative Sawyer appointed as third conferees |
2017-05-30 | House | House Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2017-05-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 85 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 14 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-11 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Phillips and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees |
2017-05-11 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 18 Nay: 22 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-01 | House | House Representative Johnson, Representative Phillips, and Representative Sawyer are appointed to replace Representative Vickrey, Representative Dove, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen, and Senator Holland are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Billinger, and Senator Rogers on the Conference Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers appointed as conferees |
2017-04-04 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Vickrey , Representative Dove and Representative Neighbor as conferees |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-09 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 85 Nay: 38 |
2017-02-09 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 8, 2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-01-17 | House | House Introduced |