KS HB2068 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Kansas sports wagering act.
Title
Creating the Kansas sports wagering act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Motion to withdraw from Committee on Federal and State Affairs withdrawn |
2019-05-02 | House | House Motion to withdraw from Committee on Federal and State Affairs pending |
2019-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-24 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2068/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2068_00_0000.pdf |