KS HB2070 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exemption to the Kansas open records act for the central registry of Kansas police and law enforcement officers.
Title
Creating an exemption to the Kansas open records act for the central registry of Kansas police and law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 107 Nay: 18 (Y: 107 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 107 Nay: 18 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion by Representative Finch to rerefer to Committee on Judiciary passed |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-18 | House | House Introduced |