KS HB2074 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a permanent exemption for certain entities from the public buildings law under the personal and family protection act.
Title
Creating a permanent exemption for certain entities from the public buildings law under the personal and family protection act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2017-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-18 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2074/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2074_00_0000.pdf |