KS HB2082 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing pharmacists to administer drugs pursuant to a prescription order.
Title
Allowing pharmacists to administer drugs pursuant to a prescription order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 20, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carlin was rejected |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carlin |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-01-24 | House | House Introduced |