KS HB2088 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing use of certified drug abuse treatment program for certain drug severity level 4 crimes; removing cannabidiol oil from the definition of marijuana.
Title
Allowing use of certified drug abuse treatment program for certain drug severity level 4 crimes; removing cannabidiol oil from the definition of marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 20, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 152-S - CANCELLED |
2017-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-01-18 | House | House Introduced |