KS HB2094 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities; contracts with other municipalities; interlocal cooperation act..
Title
Municipalities; contracts with other municipalities; interlocal cooperation act..
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 12, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 07, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, April 4, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-08 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hearing and possible action: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-19 | House | House Introduced |