KS HB2094 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the department for children and families to offer services to children with problem sexual behavior and to such child's family.
Title
Requiring the department for children and families to offer services to children with problem sexual behavior and to such child's family.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-29 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2094/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2094_00_0000.pdf |