KS HB2112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Crawford and Dickinson counties to the list of eligible rural opportunity zone counties.
Title
Adding Crawford and Dickinson counties to the list of eligible rural opportunity zone counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2019-01-31 | House | House Referred to Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2019-01-31 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2112/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2112_00_0000.pdf |