KS HB2118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2118 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Concerning property taxation; establishing notice and public hearing requirements prior to approval by a governing body to exceed its revenue neutral rate; providing a waiver of interest and fees on certain delinquent property taxes for a period of time and delaying preparation of delinquent real estate tax list and notice; prohibiting valuation increase for real property solely as the result of normal repair, replacement or maintenance of existing structure.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2118 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Concerning property taxation; establishing notice and public hearing requirements prior to approval by a governing body to exceed its revenue neutral rate; providing a waiver of interest and fees on certain delinquent property taxes for a period of time and delaying preparation of delinquent real estate tax list and notice; prohibiting valuation increase for real property solely as the result of normal repair, replacement or maintenance of existing structure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 30 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 106 Nay: 18 (Y: 106 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Alcala was rejected - Yea: 32 Nay: 86 (Y: 32 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 71 (Y: 45 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 30 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 106 Nay: 18 (Y: 106 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Alcala was rejected - Yea: 32 Nay: 86 (Y: 32 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 71 (Y: 45 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 2 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 30 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted Yea: 28 Nay: 9 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 152-S |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 106 Nay: 18 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Alcala was rejected Yea: 32 Nay: 86 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Alcala |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 71 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Representative Carpenter, B. raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2019-03-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2019-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2019-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2019-01-31 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2019-01-31 | House | House Introduced |