KS HB2122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations for FY 2020, FY 2021 and FY 2022 for various state agencies.
Title
Appropriations for FY 2020, FY 2021 and FY 2022 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2019-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2019-01-31 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2122/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2122_00_0000.pdf |