KS HB2130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas act against discrimination to include sexual orientation and gender identity or expression.
Title
Amending the Kansas act against discrimination to include sexual orientation and gender identity or expression.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2019-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-04 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2130/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2130_00_0000.pdf |